MD HB26 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a student's absence from school due to the student's mental illness is a lawful absence; requiring each county board of education to develop a certain attendance policy for students with mental illness that may identify a certain number of absences allowed within a marking period, semester, or school year; and requiring each county board to publish its attendance policy for students with mental illness on the county board's website.
Title
Attendance of Students - Lawful Absences - Mental Illness
Sponsors
Del. Mark Chang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2020-01-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-07 | House | Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-07-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Disclosure
Education
Education, Boards of
Electronic Communication
internet
Local Government Mandates
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Public Schools
Students
Time
Education
Education, Boards of
Electronic Communication
internet
Local Government Mandates
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Public Schools
Students
Time
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0026?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0026f.pdf |