MD HB26 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the person authorized to make a foreclosure sale to give written notice of the proposed sale to a specified condominium or homeowners association that, at least 30 days before the date of the proposed sale, has recorded a statement of lien against the property; requiring the trustee, within 14 days after the postponement or cancellation of a foreclosure sale, to send a notice that the sale was postponed or canceled to the record owner; applying the Act to a foreclosure sale scheduled after the effective date of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346
2017-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (46-1)
2017-03-31SenateSpecial Order until 4/4 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-02-17SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-02-16HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2017-02-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-02-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-02-13HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2017-01-24HouseHearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2017-01-18HouseHearing canceled
2017-01-24HouseHearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2016-06-14HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback