MD HB257 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Aging to conduct a certain review of certain contracts that the Department of Aging requires area agencies to enter into and make certain recommendations; requiring the Secretary to report certain findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2019; and terminating the Act after May 31, 2020.
Title
Department of Aging - Contract Review
Sponsors
Del. Carol Krimm [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2018-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Aging, Department of
Contracts
Human Relations
Procurement
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Aging, Department of
Contracts
Human Relations
Procurement
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Sunset