MD HB255 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB498

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of at least $100,000 for grants to certain nonprofit organizations and area agencies on aging to expand and establish aging-in-place programs for seniors; requiring at least 20% of the appropriated funding be used to support senior villages, local, member-driven, nonprofit organizations that support community members who choose to age in place; and altering the definition of "aging-in-place program" to include community participation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22HouseWithdrawn by Sponsor
2021-01-04HouseHearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2020-09-22HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB498 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback