MD HB255 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Continuing the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law) by extending to July 1, 2019, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Program; authorizing the Program to disclose specified information to specified persons under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Legislative Services to conduct a direct full evaluation of the Program on or before December 1, 2017; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 92
2014-03-26HouseReturned Passed
2014-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2014-03-25SenateSecond Reading Passed
2014-03-25SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2014-03-20SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-03SenateFirst Reading Finance
2014-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2014-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {566284/1 Report Adopted
2014-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2014-01-30HouseHearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-20HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0255&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0255f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0255t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_92_hb0255t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0255_56628401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0255.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0255_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0255_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0255,h-0196&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0255,s-0724&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback