MD HB255 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adding Allegany County to the provisions of law relating to the Cecil County, Garrett County, and St. Mary's County Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-09HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 93
2013-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2013-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2013-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2013-03-26SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-28SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2013-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2013-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed
2013-02-26HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2013-02-25HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2013-02-05HouseHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2013-01-23HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback