MD HB254 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Highway Administration to conduct an infrastructure review of each pedestrian or bicyclist fatality that occurs on a State highway or at an intersection of a State highway and another highway or a municipal street to identify certain deficiencies and identify appropriate corrective actions; and requiring the Administration to complete the review within 6 months after being notified by law enforcement of a pedestrian or bicyclist fatality and publish the review on its website.
Title
State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-4) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {693829/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB874 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Subjects
Accidents
Bicycles
Construction
Data
Death
Electronic Government
Equipment
Examinations
Highways
Inspections
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Pedestrians
Reports
Safety
Signs and Billboards
State Highway Administration
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Highways
Bicycles
Construction
Data
Death
Electronic Government
Equipment
Examinations
Highways
Inspections
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Pedestrians
Reports
Safety
Signs and Billboards
State Highway Administration
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Highways
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 8 | 204.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |