MD HB252 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each correctional facility to designate an employee to act as the correctional facility's voting coordinator; providing the purpose of the coordinator is to facilitate voter registration and voting by eligible detainees by informing eligible detainees of upcoming elections, the dissemination of eligibility requirements and voter registration applications, and the transmission of certain applications and ballots between eligible detainees and the local boards of elections; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law – Correctional Facilities – Voting Coordinators

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-41) (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {923120/2 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (41-95) (Y: 42 N: 96 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {223629/1 (Delegate Corderman) Rejected (39-97) (Y: 40 N: 98 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (96-41)
2019-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13HouseFloor Amendment {223629/1 (Delegate Corderman) Rejected (39-97)
2019-03-13HouseFloor Amendment {923120/2 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (41-95)
2019-03-08HouseSpecial Order until 03/12 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
2019-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {395468/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-25HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0252&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0252f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0252t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0252_39546801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0252_22362901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0252_92312002.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0252.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0252_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0419.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0420.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0440.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback