MD HB251 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Aging to make grants to certain nonprofit organizations and area agencies on aging to expand and establish certain aging-in-place programs for seniors; requiring the Department to publicize the availability of the grants at least 6 weeks before the applications are due; establishing a requirement for an equal match for certain funds; requiring the Department to notify an area agency on aging within 2 weeks after a grant award is made to a nonprofit located within the agency's jurisdiction; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA")

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed 47-0 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 308
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {926085/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback