MD HB251 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a county board of education to provide age-appropriate instruction on the meaning of "consent" which is defined as the unambiguous and voluntary agreement between all participants in each physical act within the course of interpersonal relationships, including respect for personal boundaries; and requiring the county board to provide age-appropriate instruction on the meaning of "consent" as part of the Family Life and Human Sexuality curriculum beginning in the 2018-2019 school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Boundaries and Consent

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-17) (Y: 118 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-28SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed (117-17)
2018-02-23HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {585569/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-22HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-15HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-30HouseHearing canceled
2018-02-08HouseHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback