MD HB247 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending to October 1, 2028, the authority of the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to impose a transfer tax on certain instruments of writing.
Title
St. Mary's County - Transfer Tax - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427 |
2023-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2023-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
County Commissioners
Land Records
Recordation
Records
St. Mary's County
Sunset
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Land Records
Recordation
Records
St. Mary's County
Sunset
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
St. Mary's County | 138 | 1B | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
St. Mary's County | 138 | 1F | (n/a) | See Bill Text |