MD HB247 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1063
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 680
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 680
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a carrier, during the 30 days following the individual's birthday, to make available to an individual enrolled in a Medicare supplement policy different Medicare supplement policies with benefits that are equal to or less than the benefits of the individual's existing coverage; prohibiting a carrier, for a policy required to be made available under the Act, from denying or conditioning the effectiveness of the policy or discriminating in the pricing of the policy based on certain factors; etc.
Title
Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policies - Open Enrollment Period Following Birthday
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 680 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (121-0) |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {753525/1 Adopted |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1063 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.