MD HB247 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB142
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the training materials used by the program of instruction for election judges to include oral and written instructions in the various methods an election judge may use to accommodate voters in need of assistance; requiring the State Board to produce materials to be posted at polling places relating to accommodations for voters in need of assistance; Requiring a chief election judge to give voting order priority to persons with mobility problems, a person assisting others with mobility problems, and persons with a disabled child; etc.
Title
Election Law - Accommodations for Voters in Need of Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {613929/1 Adopted |
2021-02-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2020-07-08 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB142 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Ballots
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Curriculum
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Emergencies
Job Training
Laws and Ordinances
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Voting
Weights and Measures
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Curriculum
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Emergencies
Job Training
Laws and Ordinances
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Voting
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 10 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 10 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 10 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |