MD HB245 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Student Data Privacy Council to study the development and implementation of the Student Data Privacy Act of 2015 and review similar laws and best practices in other states and appropriate technologies; specifying the membership of the Council; requiring the Council to report its recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2020, regarding potential statutory and regulatory changes to the Student Data Privacy Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Student Data Privacy Council

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 398
2019-04-01HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-04-01HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {154835/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-14HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-02-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {375266/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0245&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0245f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0245t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0245e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0245_37526601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0245_15483501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0245.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0245_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0092.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0245_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0873.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1063.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback