MD HB245 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness in the Department of Commerce to be the Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board; and altering the composition of the Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Commerce - Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness - Renaming and Restructuring

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259
2017-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-04-04SenateSpecial Order until 4/5 (Senator Astle) Adopted
2017-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2017-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2017-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {563699/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2017-02-08HouseHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-23HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0245?ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0245f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0245t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_259_hb0245t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0245_56369901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0245.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0245_ecm.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0245_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0245,h-0533&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0245,s-1167&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback