MD HB245 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a health care practitioner involved in the delivery or care of a substance-exposed newborn to make a report to a local department of social services except under specified circumstances; establishing that a report made under the Act does not create a specified presumption; requiring the Department of Human Resources to submit a preliminary report to the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2014, and a final report on or before October 1, 2015; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law - Substance-Exposed Newborns

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) {223424/1 Rejected (45-87) (Y: 45 N: 87 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) Rejected (43-88) (Y: 43 N: 88 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-09HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 90
2013-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2013-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2013-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2013-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-03-20SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2013-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2013-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-14HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {223424/1 Rejected (45-87)
2013-03-14HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (43-88)
2013-03-14HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
2013-03-14HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {123726/3
2013-03-12HouseSpecial Order until 3/14 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
2013-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {812619/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2013-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-01-25HouseHearing cancelled
2013-02-14HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-01-23HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0245?ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0245f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0245t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/Chapters_noln/CH_90_hb0245t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0245_81261901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0245_12372603.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0245_22342401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0245.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0245_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0245_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0245,h-0350&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0245,h-0351&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0245,h-0430&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0245,s-0993&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments

feedback