MD HB244 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a register of wills to accept certain documents filed electronically through a system established by the register of wills; and prohibiting a register of wills from refusing to accept a document based on the manner in which it was signed.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Electronic Filing and Signatures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661 |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2023-02-22 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-20 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2023-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m. |
2023-01-23 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB253 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 2 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |