MD HB244 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the date from November 15 to November 1 by which a member of the General Assembly may request the Department of Legislative Services to prepare a bill for prefile at a regular session under certain circumstances; and altering the date from the second Friday after Thanksgiving to the preceding November 20 by which a member may direct the Department to prefile a bill under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Assembly – Prefiled Bills – Deadlines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-2) (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 71
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-26SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-23HouseThird Reading Passed (129-2)
2018-02-21HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-02-21HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-20HouseFavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-02-19HouseHearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback