MD HB241 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that a ground lease holder may not bring any suit, action, or proceeding against the current leasehold tenant or a former leasehold tenant to recover the ground rent that was due and owing before the date the current leasehold tenant acquired title to the leasehold interest if the ground lease was not registered in accordance with certain law prior to the date the current leasehold tenant acquired title, notwithstanding any other provision of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Ground Leases - Past Due Ground Rent

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2020-02-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-17HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-17HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-17HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB170 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-14 - Referred Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Real Property8707(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8806(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback