MD HB24 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a prospective bidder or offeror when submitting a bid or offer for a public work contract to submit to the public body a certain contractor safety and health plan and a certain attestation; requiring a contractor safety and health plan to include certain information; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to develop a certain safety and health calculation worksheet and certain safety and health rating system; requiring the Commissioner to adopt regulations to carry out the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2019-01-16HouseHearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-14HouseReassigned to Economic Matters
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
2018-11-20HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback