MD HB236 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 123
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 123
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that the Department of Natural Resources submit certain reports to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2019; and repealing the termination provisions for certain provisions of law relating to the issuance of complimentary or discounted hunting and fishing licenses to certain military personnel, former prisoners of war, recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and disabled veterans.
Title
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, Recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and Disabled Veterans
Sponsors
Del. Ned Carey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 123 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {950413/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB25 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Armed Forces
Disabilities
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Veterans
Disabilities
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |