MD HB235 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a manufacturer or distributor to be licensed as a vehicle dealer if the manufacturer or distributor deals only in electric or nonfossil-fuel burning vehicles, no dealer in the State holds a franchise from the manufacturer or distributor, and the manufacturer or distributor does not have a specified relationship with another manufacturer or distributor licensed as a dealer under the Act; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to adopt regulations to implement the Act; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Distributors - Sale of Electric or Nonfossil-Fuel Burning Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-15) (Y: 122 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-15) |
2015-04-13 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {113122/1 Withdrawn |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) {123323/1 Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) {123323/1 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {898179/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {770116/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Energy Matters
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicles
Rules and Regulations
Shopping Centers
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Energy Matters
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicles
Rules and Regulations
Shopping Centers
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration