MD HB233 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 745
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 745
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a holder of a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license to the list of license holders in Montgomery County eligible to be issued a Class 7 micro-brewery license by the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission; and increasing the number of alcoholic beverages licenses that the Board of License Commissioners for Montgomery County is authorized to issue in the Town of Kensington.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Micro-Brewery License and Licenses in the Town of Kensington MC 07-22
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 745 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {613422/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-01-13 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Montgomery County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Montgomery County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 25 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 25 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 25 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |