MD HB232 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the deadlines for the interim and final reporting requirements for the Maryland Zero Emission Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council; altering the membership of the Council by adding one representative of an electric vehicle driver advocacy organization instead of the Baltimore Electric Vehicle Initiative, two, instead of one, representative of the environmental community, and one from a new vehicle dealer association in the State; and extending until June 30, 2026, the termination date for the Council.
Title
Maryland Zero Emission Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council - Reporting, Membership, and Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 118 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {840910/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Environmental Matters
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Environmental Matters
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2013 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |