MD HB230 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB300
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that inmates serving a term of life imprisonment may be paroled without the Governor's approval after serving 30 years without application of diminution of confinement credits.
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-12 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-10-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB300 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Criminal Law - Procedure
Governor
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Review Boards
Time
Governor
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Review Boards
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 4 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 7 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |