MD HB230 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the driver of a vehicle to drive on the left side of the roadway in a no-passing zone to overtake and pass at a safe distance a bicycle traveling in the same direction in accordance with a certain provision of law and in a certain manner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 114
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (35-11)
2020-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-12SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2020-03-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {100211/1 Adopted
2020-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-21HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-16HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB199 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 115

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation21305(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation21307(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback