MD HB230 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 768
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 768
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which the State may withdraw from the Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative by requiring the General Assembly to enact a law approving the withdrawal.
Title
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-5) (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-48) (Y: 88 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-48) (Y: 88 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 768 |
2018-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-5) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (87-48) |
2018-02-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |