MD HB230 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date of specified provisions of law relating to the assignment of benefits and reimbursement of nonpreferred providers.
Title
Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79 |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {686186/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Insurance - Health
Physicians
Reimbursement Rates
Sunset
Disclosure
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Insurance - Health
Physicians
Reimbursement Rates
Sunset