MD HB229 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-07 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that certain sales of tangible personal property be attributed to the State for apportionment purposes under the corporate income tax if the corporation is not taxable in the state of the purchaser; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporate Income Tax – Throwback Rule

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-07HouseHearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2020-09-01HousePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General10402(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback