MD HB229 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "net taxable income" for purposes of calculating specified State aid formulas for education; requiring the Comptroller to certify annually the amount of net taxable income in a specified manner; requiring State aid for education to be paid in a specified manner under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
State Aid for Public Education - Certification of Net Taxable Income
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4 |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | House | Special Order until 3/8 (Delegate Barkley) Adopted |
2013-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |