MD HB228 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to provide a revised printed statement of an individual's State criminal history record to the Board if the criminal history record information is reported to the Central Repository after the date of the initial criminal history records check; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Nursing – Criminal History Records Checks – Revised Statement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {176286/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback