MD HB224 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of General Services, the Secretary of Transportation, the Chancellor of the University System of Maryland, and the President of Morgan State University to adopt regulations to require the qualification of a business as a small business if it has obtained a certain federal certification; requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations providing for the certification of a business as a minority business enterprise if it has obtained a certain federal certification and meets certain requirements; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and Certification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-05SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-02HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-02-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {586588/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-27HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-01-31HouseHearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-01-26HouseHearing canceled
2018-01-31HouseHearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-18HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback