MD HB222 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB771
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an Executive Branch agency from banning or regulating the sale of coffee in conjunction with a career exploration and development activity created for or organized by students with individualized education programs in a public high school in Baltimore County or Frederick County; and repealing a certain exception that prohibited the sale of coffee in certain public high schools in Baltimore County except under certain circumstances.
Title
Baltimore County and Frederick County - Career Activities in Public High Schools - Sale of Coffee by Students With Individualized Education Programs
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2023-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB771 (Carry Over) 2022-02-08 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Baltimore County
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Food
Frederick County
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Retail Sales
Secondary Schools
Special Education
Students
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Food
Frederick County
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Retail Sales
Secondary Schools
Special Education
Students