MD HB221 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB755
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an eligible sponsor organization providing recreational opportunities with grant funding from the Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund to provide at no cost an angler's license and trout stamps, a Chesapeake Bay and coastal sport fishing license, or a hunting license and any corresponding stamps to certain persons.
Title
Natural Resources – Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund – No–Cost Licenses and Stamps
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB755 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
SB665 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
SB665 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Subjects
Fish and Fishing
Grants
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources
Revenue and Taxes
Stamps and Coins
Grants
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources
Revenue and Taxes
Stamps and Coins
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 1 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |