MD HB221 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each county or municipality, to the extent practicable, to expedite the process for the application and issuance of a permit related to or required for the construction of public or private school facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government – School Construction – Permits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 81
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-20SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-02SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2018-02-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {784469/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-06HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-18HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback