MD HB221 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county or municipality, to the extent practicable, to expedite the process for the application and issuance of a permit related to or required for the construction of public or private school facilities.
Title
Local Government – School Construction – Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81 |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2018-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {784469/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Construction
Counties
Licenses
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Counties
Licenses
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools