MD HB22 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2022, a person from using, manufacturing, or knowingly selling or distributing Class B fire-fighting foam that contains intentionally added PFAS chemicals in the State; prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2022, a person from manufacturing, selling, or distributing a certain rug or carpet in the State; prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2022, a manufacturer or distributor from manufacturing, selling, or distributing certain food packaging in the State; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment - PFAS Chemicals - Prohibitions and Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22HouseHearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
2021-01-22HouseHearing canceled
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
2020-10-13HousePre-filed
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB195 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment61601(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment61602(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment61603(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment61604(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment61604.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment61605(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment91901(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment91902(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment91903(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment91904(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment91905(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback