MD HB218 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adding an adult grandchild of a certain decedent to the list of persons who have the right to arrange for the final disposition of the body of the decedent; requiring a person to forfeit the right of final disposition of a decedent and that right pass to the next qualifying person under certain circumstances; providing that a certain person's right of disposition may be restored under certain circumstances; authorizing a person to waive the right of final disposition; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 232
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {347776/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-04SenateFirst Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {686189/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/06 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0218&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0218f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0218t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0218e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_232_hb0218e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0218_68618901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0218_34777601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0218.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0218_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0248.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0218_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0218_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0953.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1169.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback