MD HB216 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a certain provision of law requiring a financial aid administrator to verify certain information under certain circumstances; altering the method by which a financial administrator at a public institution of higher education is required to verify that a certain youth is a homeless youth; providing that a foster care recipient or a homeless youth who receives a tuition exemption is a priority for on-campus housing; requiring a public institution to designate a certain homeless and foster student liaison; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 256
2021-04-12HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-09SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-11SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-10HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2021-03-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {174365/1 Adopted
2021-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2021-01-19HouseHearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2020-10-30HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB155 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education15106.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback