MD HB215 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a custodian of records to grant inspection of part of a 9-1-1 communications record under certain circumstances after providing certain notice and considering certain information; requiring a custodian to grant or deny a certain application within a certain period of time; authorizing a custodian to redact certain information if a failure to do so would result in a constructive denial of the entire public record; requiring a custodian to allow inspection by the person in interest; etc.
Title
Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-02 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {146088/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Communications
Death
Disclosure
Domestic Violence
Emergencies
Family Law
Identification
Murder
Notices
Photography
Privacy
Public Information
Recordings
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Victims
Death
Disclosure
Domestic Violence
Emergencies
Family Law
Identification
Murder
Notices
Photography
Privacy
Public Information
Recordings
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Victims