MD HB213 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the date, to on or before December 31, 2020, by which the Department of Natural Resources is required to prepare a certain fishery management plan for the cownose ray species, subject to available funding; and continuing the prohibition on a person sponsoring, conducting, or participating in a cownose ray fishing contest in State waters until the Department prepares a fishery management plan, as required by certain provisions of law, for the cownose ray species.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-4) (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 343
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (134-4)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {440018/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback