MD HB21 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to make available to the public on the Internet live video streaming of each open meeting of the authority held at the Authority's headquarters or any other location where the authority held at least 10 meetings in the preceding calendar year; requiring the Authority to make available to the public on the Internet complete and unedited archived video recordings of streamed open meetings; and requiring the Authority to make the archived video recordings available for a minimum of 4 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Streaming and Archiving - Open Meetings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (139-1)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {766485/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-07-03HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback