MD HB209 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering certain provisions governing the issuance of stock, convertible securities, and scrip; clarifying the authority of corporations to hold annual meetings by remote communication; clarifying the application of certain provisions of law to the conversion of a corporation; requiring a real estate investment trust that voluntarily dissolves to file a notice of termination with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporations and Associations - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 560
2023-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2023-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2023-04-05SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2023-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2023-03-06SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2023-03-03HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2023-03-01HouseSecond Reading Passed
2023-03-01HouseFavorable Adopted
2023-02-28HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2023-01-25HouseHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-01-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB58 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-23 - Referred Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Corporations and Associations12307(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations2203(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations2210(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations2214(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations2501(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations2503(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations4601(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations4A402(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5202(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations8502(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback