MD HB208 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each county board of education to ensure that each public school provide, at no charge to students, menstrual hygiene products via dispensers in the restrooms at the school; requiring a public middle or high school to install menstrual hygiene product dispensers in at least two restrooms on or before October 1, 2020, and certain restrooms on or before August 1, 2024; requiring a public elementary school to install menstrual hygiene product dispensers in at least one restroom by October 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (100-31)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {965563/1 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-01-16HouseHearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-16HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7446(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback