MD HB206 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 108
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a certain unaccompanied minor in need of shelter to consent to shelter and supportive services under certain circumstances; authorizing an unaccompanied minor who is a parent to consent to shelter and supportive services for the minor's child; requiring a certain service provider to contact a parent, a guardian, or an adult relative of an unaccompanied minor within 72 hours; requiring a service provider to develop procedures to screen staff members who work with minors including a criminal history check; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 108
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-12SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {614868/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-01-17HouseHearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-17HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-16HouseHearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-16HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB207 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 109

Subjects


Code Citations


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback