MD HB206 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring disqualification of an individual from receiving unemployment insurance benefits if the individual leaves employment to serve a sentence of imprisonment for a felony conviction.
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Disqualification - Imprisonment for Felony Conviction
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0206.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0206f.pdf |