MD HB204 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB356
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to review the filing fees and associated requirements of neighboring states that are equivalent or substantially similar to the filing fees required under ยง 1-203(b)(3)(ii) of the Corporations and Associations Article, and report, on or before January 1, 2021, recommendations to make Maryland more competitive with neighboring states, including whether to establish less frequent filing requirements; etc.
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-2) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {223992/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-16 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB204 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Budget and Taxation
SB359 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
SB359 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Corporations and Associations
Exemptions
Federal Government
Fees
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Time
Veterans
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Corporations and Associations
Exemptions
Federal Government
Fees
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Time
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Corporations and Associations | 1 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |