MD HB203 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a will may be made self-proved in a certain manner; establishing certain requirements for a self-proving will; requiring a certain self-proving will to be acknowledged by the testator before a notary public; requiring a certain self-proving affidavit to be attached or annexed to a self-proving will; altering the requirements of an advance medical directive; requiring a declarant to acknowledge a certain advance medical directive before a notary public; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-23HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2020-07-28HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB519 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-05 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Estates and Trusts1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Estates and Trusts4102(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General5602(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback