MD HB203 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing recipients of a senatorial or delegate scholarship to use the scholarship to reimburse certain expenses for certificate or license programs or for certain courses or sequences of courses at community colleges; and exempting certain applicants from the requirement that certain senatorial scholarship recipients take a certain examination and be enrolled in certain institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Reimbursement of Expenses for Community College Certification and Licensure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 375
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {904536/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {105060/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-18HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0203&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0203f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0203t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0203e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_375_hb0203e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0203_10506001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0203_90453601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0203.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0203_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0406.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0203_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0980.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1091.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback