MD HB202 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court after a certain finding of incompetency or not criminally responsible due to a mental disorder to order the Maryland Department of Health as soon as possible after the defendant's admission, but not later than 48 hours, to evaluate a defendant, to develop a treatment plan, and to make a determination as to whether the defendant is a danger to self or others under certain circumstances; requiring a panel to convene within 9 days after a certain individual's refusal of medication for certain purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure – Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility – Court–Ordered Evaluation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {672716/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-01-30HouseHearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-18HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback